Global Patent Index - EP 0609762 B1

EP 0609762 B1 2000-05-03 - Method for controlling the cooking in a cooking apparatus having browning- and microwave generating devices

Title (en)

Method for controlling the cooking in a cooking apparatus having browning- and microwave generating devices

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern des Kochvorganges in einem Kochgerät mit bräunung- und mikrowellenerzeugenden Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande de cuisson d'un appareil de cuisson comportant un dispositif de dorage et un dispositif de génération d'énergie micro-ondes

Publication

EP 0609762 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94101110 A

Priority

FR 9301114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0609762A1] The invention relates to a cooking apparatus (1) which includes a browning device (3), a device (4) for generating microwave energy, means for selecting heating sequences and means for controlling the electrical power supply circuit of the browning device and/or of the device for generating microwave energy. When one heating sequence is initiated, after a user has selected the type and the weight of a foodstuff to be treated, the control means of the cooking apparatus determine an optimum heating time T which depends, on the one hand, on a threshold weight value P0 and, on the other hand, on the selected heating sequence. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/68; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/02 (2006.01); H05B 6/68 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01); H05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6482 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0609762 A1 19940810; EP 0609762 B1 20000503; DE 69424198 D1 20000608; DE 69424198 T2 20000921; FR 2701093 A1 19940805; FR 2701093 B1 19950414; JP 3817276 B2 20060906; JP H06294519 A 19941021; US 5408075 A 19950418

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030126

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MOULINEX S.A.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424198 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOULINEX S.A.

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

1996-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961008

1994-10-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940822

1994-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE