Global Patent Index - EP 0610769 B1

EP 0610769 B1 2001-05-16 - Loudspeaker

Title (en)

Loudspeaker

Title (de)

Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0610769 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101385 A

Priority

JP 3749093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0610769A2] A magnetic gap-less loudspeaker of a high performance which has a good quality of a voice coil and provides easy wiring between tinsel wires and the voice coil. In the magnetic gap-less loudspeaker, two magnets (M1, M2) magnetized in the thickness direction are disposed with the same poles being faced each other and a voice coil (1) is disposed in a magnetic field generated by repulsion magnetic fluxes near at the outer circumferential areas of the magnets, wherein a reinforced paper 1B or bobbin material 1A1 is attached to at least a partial area of the outer surface of the voice coil. Conductive areas 1C are provided to the reinforced paper or bobbin material to which areas coil lead wires or tinsel wires are connected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/02; H04R 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/025 (2013.01); H04R 9/02 (2013.01); H04R 9/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0610769 A2 19940817; EP 0610769 A3 19941012; EP 0610769 B1 20010516; DE 610769 T1 19950824; DE 69427200 D1 20010621; DE 69427200 T2 20020328; DE 971559 T1 20000831; EP 0971559 A2 20000112; EP 0971559 A3 20060816; JP 3011826 B2 20000221; JP H0715796 A 19950117

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69427200

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130131

2012-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69427200

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69427200

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120202

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69427200

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427200 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980407

1995-08-24 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1995-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950410

1995-05-05 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1994-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-08-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD

1994-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB