Global Patent Index - EP 0610801 B2

EP 0610801 B2 2002-09-04 - Handtool for machining surfaces

Title (en)

Handtool for machining surfaces

Title (de)

Handwerkzeugmaschine zur Flächenbearbeitung

Title (fr)

Outil à main de surfaçage

Publication

EP 0610801 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94101587 A

Priority

  • DE 4303044 A
  • EP 95118775 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0610801A1] In the case of a handtool (1) for machining surfaces, having a machine casing (2) which accommodates a motor (3) and carrying, preferably at the front, on a toolholder (9) a rotating, revolving or oscillating tool (8), in particular an abrasive plate (8) with a triangular base for receiving triangular abrasive sheets with Velcro fastening, the object of providing a construction which is particularly easy to manufacture and has low weight, low noise development, low power requirement and tool change without auxiliary tool for tools of different application areas is achieved in that the toolholder (9) is designed in the manner of a shell with a base or contour, in particular a triangular base or contour, substantially corresponding to the base of the abrasive plate (8) and is supported by the edge (69) on the abrasive plate (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0610801 A1 19940817; EP 0610801 B1 19960710; EP 0610801 B2 20020904; DE 4303044 A1 19940811

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-03-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-02-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-05 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-09-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2002-09-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 95118775.6 EINGEREICHT AM 29/11/95.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1997-06-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KINZO B.V.

- Effective date: 19970409

1996-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960913

1996-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1996-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

1996-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59400402 19960814

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-07-10 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 95118775.6 EINGEREICHT AM 29/11/95.

1995-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950503

1995-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950217

1994-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI