Global Patent Index - EP 0610917 B1

EP 0610917 B1 2000-04-26 - Anti-counterfeit security device for documents in general

Title (en)

Anti-counterfeit security device for documents in general

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung gegen Fälschung für Dokumente im allgemeinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité anti-contrefaçon pour documents en général

Publication

EP 0610917 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101987 A

Priority

IT MI930251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0610917A1] An anti-counterfeit security device for documents in general in the form of a tape-like or filament-like supporting element (1) made of polyester. On the tape or filament, a first security element (2;2a,2b,2c) is provided which can be detected by devices and is constituted by regions made of a material which can be detected by magnetoresistors and are arranged in succession to generate a signal that can be decoded by the magnetoresistors, and a second security element (10;30) is also provided, visually detectable in transmitted light, which is constituted by portions of the regions that are free from the magnetoresistor-detectable material in order to form graphic markings optically perceivable in transmitted light. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00; B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/12 (2013.01); B42D 25/355 (2014.10); G07D 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0610917 A1 19940817; EP 0610917 B1 20000426; EP 0610917 B2 20070718; AT 192252 T 20000515; DE 69424075 D1 20000531; DE 69424075 T2 20000914; DE 69424075 T3 20080529; DK 0610917 T3 20000904; ES 2145070 T3 20000701; ES 2145070 T5 20080116; GR 3033915 T3 20001130; IT 1263970 B 19960905; IT MI930251 A1 19940812; IT MI930251 D0 19930211; PT 610917 E 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120210

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 192252 T

- Effective date: 20120209

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69424075

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120210

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120209

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-07-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: FEDRIGONI S.P.A., IT

- Document: AT 192252 T

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-03-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: FEDRIGONI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-03-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FEDRIGONI S.P.A., IT

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-01-13 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: FEDRIGONI S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L., IT

2011-12-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111124 AND 20111129

2011-12-21 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111214

2011-12-21 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111214

2011-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070209

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071019

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070209

2008-01-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-01-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-11-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-09-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-08-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-08-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-08-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-08-07 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-07-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2007-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-04-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.

2006-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-10 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-09 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-10-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L., IT

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-08-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.

- Free text: MANTEGAZZA ANTONIO ARTI GRAFICHE S.R.L.#VIA MILANO 71#20021 OSPIATE DI BOLLATE (MILAN) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- FABRIANO SECURITIES S.R.L.#VIA DEL LINFANO, 16#38062 ARCO (TRENTO) (IT)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-09-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145070 T3

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424075 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192252 T 20000515

1996-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960502

1995-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950121

1994-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE