Global Patent Index - EP 0611985 B1

EP 0611985 B1 2001-12-05 - Process for producing a silver halide photographic emulsion

Title (en)

Process for producing a silver halide photographic emulsion

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer photographischen Silberhalogenidemulsion

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation d'une émulsion photographique à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 0611985 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101084 A

Priority

JP 4442893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0611985A1] A silver halide photographic light-sensitive emulsion is disclosed. The emulsion comprises silver halide grains formed under a condition in which fine grains of silver halide are supplied into the protective colloid solution, in which the silver halide grains are formed, in a period in the course of formation of the grains, and the sum of projection area of tabular grains each having a aspect ratio larger than 1.2 accounts for lower than 50 % of the total projection area of the whole silver halide grains of the emulsion, and the tabular grains have an average aspect ratio is more than 1.2 and less than 5.0 and an average grain size of not larger than 0.6 mu m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/06 (2006.01); G03C 1/07 (2006.01); G03C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 5/02 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0611985 A1 19940824; EP 0611985 B1 20011205; JP 3278005 B2 20020430; JP H06235989 A 19940823; US 5380640 A 19950110

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040125

2004-01-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040125

2003-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-03-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A SILVER HALIDE PHOTOGRAPHIC EMULSION

1995-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950323

1995-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950222

1994-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB