EP 0612059 A3 19950816 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE PROPAGATION TIME IN NOISY SPEECH CHANNELS.
Title (en)
METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE PROPAGATION TIME IN NOISY SPEECH CHANNELS.
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 4243831 A 19921223
Abstract (en)
[origin: US5479517A] The present invention relates to a method of reducing noise in a speech detection system. The phases of at least two noise-affected signals are estimated. The phase estimate and the phase compensation required for the noise reduction are performed in the frequency domain. The background noise and the transient behavior of the enclosed space are simultaneously estimated.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01H 17/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G10L 21/0208 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 2021/02165 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4254417 A 19810303 - SPEISER JEFFREY M
- [A] US 4333170 A 19820601 - MATHEWS LEMUEL P, et al
- [A] US 4112430 A 19780905 - LADSTATTER JAMES A
- [DA] SCHLANG: "Ein Verfahren zur automatischen Ermittlung der Sprecherposition bei Freisprechen", ITG-FACHTAGUNG: DIGITALE SPRACHVERARBEITUNG, 26 August 1988 (1988-08-26) - 28 August 1988 (1988-08-28), BAD NAUHEIM, pages 69 - 73
- [A] ZELINSKI: "A microphone array with adaptive post-filtering for noise reduction in reverberant rooms", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING 1988, vol. 5, 11 April 1988 (1988-04-11) - 14 April 1988 (1988-04-14), NEW YORK, NY, US, pages 2578 - 2581
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 4243831 A1 19940630; DE 59309463 D1 19990422; EP 0612059 A2 19940824; EP 0612059 A3 19950816; EP 0612059 B1 19990317; US 5479517 A 19951226
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 4243831 A 19921223; DE 59309463 T 19931211; EP 93120010 A 19931211; US 17147293 A 19931223