Global Patent Index - EP 0612119 B1

EP 0612119 B1 2001-12-05 - Car glazing with a printed conductor structure

Title (en)

Car glazing with a printed conductor structure

Title (de)

Autoglasscheibe mit einer gedruckten Leiterstruktur

Title (fr)

Vitrage automobile pourvu d'une structure imprimée de conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0612119 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94400288 A

Priority

DE 4304788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0612119A1] A motor car window (18) is provided, on one of its faces, with electrical conductors (19) which are printed on and baked into place. A prefabricated element (20) is bonded to this surface fitted with the conductors (19) and has a multilayer structure and comprises insulating layers and at least one electrical conductor (24, 25, 26) placed on an insulating layer. The prefabricated element (20) is placed on the conductors (19) baked into place. It is provided with a mounting surface (21) intended for an electronic module and with a mounting surface (22) intended for a plug for connecting to a miniature cable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1278 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4304788 A1 19940818; DE 4304788 C2 19960515; EP 0612119 A1 19940824; EP 0612119 B1 20011205; ES 2168291 T3 20020616

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140209

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-03-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140209

2014-02-28 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-02-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69429293

2014-02-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69429293

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168291 T3

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429293 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

1997-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961127

1995-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950210

1994-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE