Global Patent Index - EP 0612682 B2

EP 0612682 B2 2000-01-12 - Device for piling paper sheets

Title (en)

Device for piling paper sheets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ansammeln von Papierbogen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empiler des feuilles de papier

Publication

EP 0612682 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94102118 A

Priority

DE 4305579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0612682A1] The invention relates to a stacking device for piling paper sheets with upper belts conveying into a pile delivery. The aim is to make the device more reliable in the pile formation for high conveying speeds in a simplified construction. This is achieved in that the lower strands of the upper belts (23) transporting the sheets (26) are returned in front of the stop face of a front aligner (21) around a relatively sharp-edged belt deflection (29), the sheets being deflected downwards in the region of the belt deflection by fenders or stop plates (37 or 48) running at an acute angle to the conveying plane of the sheets and having openings (38) for the upper belts. In this way, the paper sheets are secured against curving up at their leading edge even at high conveying speeds, and a satisfactory pile is formed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/36 (2006.01); B65H 31/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/14 (2013.01); B65H 31/36 (2013.01); B65H 2511/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/10 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4305579 A1 19940825; EP 0612682 A1 19940831; EP 0612682 B1 19960501; EP 0612682 B2 20000112; ES 2087777 T3 19960716; FI 940847 A0 19940223; FI 940847 A 19940825; JP H06316359 A 19941115; US 5397120 A 19950314

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2000-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-01-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1998-12-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

1998-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

1998-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1998-09-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980228

1998-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980228

1998-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980228

1998-02-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 19980212

1998-02-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980212

1998-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980211

1997-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19970326

- Year of fee payment: 4

1997-03-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH + CO.

- Effective date: 19970123

1997-02-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19970221

- Year of fee payment: 4

1997-02-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19970214

- Year of fee payment: 4

1997-02-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19970203

- Year of fee payment: 4

1996-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2087777

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1996-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960524

1996-06-11 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2087777

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1996-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59400236

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-06-05

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1995-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950504

1995-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950210

1994-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE