Global Patent Index - EP 0613044 B1

EP 0613044 B1 2001-05-16 - Photographic material containing silver halide grains doped with hexa-coordinated cyano-complex

Title (en)

Photographic material containing silver halide grains doped with hexa-coordinated cyano-complex

Title (de)

Photographisches Material, das mit einem hexakoordinierten Cyanocomplex dotierte Silberhalogenidkörner enthält

Title (fr)

Matériau photographique contenant des grains à l'halogénure d'argent dopés au complexe cyano hexacoordiné

Publication

EP 0613044 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94102828 A

Priority

JP 3560593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0613044A2] A silver halide photographic material comprises a support and a light-sensitive layer provided thereon. The light-sensitive layer contains silver halide grains dispersed in gelatin. A hexa-coordinated cyano-complex is doped in the silver halide grains. The amount of the complex is in the range of 1x10<-><7> to 5x10<-><3> mole based on 1 mole of silver halide. A localized phase of the complex is present on the surface of the grains. According to the present invention, the silver halide grains are doped in the presence of a compound having a function of inhibiting a reaction of the cyano-complex with gelatin, or the compound having the function is added to the grains after the grains are doped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/08; G03C 1/035; G03C 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/09 (2013.01); G03C 1/08 (2013.01); G03C 1/035 (2013.01); G03C 1/07 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03535 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0818 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0827 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0836 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0845 (2013.01); G03C 2001/091 (2013.01); G03C 2001/093 (2013.01); G03C 2001/094 (2013.01); G03C 2200/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0613044 A2 19940831; EP 0613044 A3 19950726; EP 0613044 B1 20010516; DE 69427203 D1 20010621; DE 69427203 T2 20010906

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-10-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020224

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020224

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427203 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

1996-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960715

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960124

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1994-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL