Global patent index - EP 0613322 B1

EP 0613322 B1 2000-08-16 - Loudspeaker

Title (en)

Loudspeaker

Title (de)

Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0613322 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101384 A

Priority

JP 3748993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0613322A2] A loudspeaker having a repulsion magnetic circuit capable of suppressing negative magnetic fluxes. The loudspeaker has magnets with the same poles being faced each other and an outer magnet magnetized in a direction different from the counter magnets is disposed outside of the counter magnets. A voice coil containing magnetic material is disposed outside of a magnet magnetized in a radial direction from the inner wall to the outer wall of the magnet, or outside of a magnet assembled by magnet pieces magnetized in a predetermined direction and arranged to take the same magnetization direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/02; H04R 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/045 (2013.01); H04R 9/025 (2013.01); H04R 2209/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0613322 A2 19940831; EP 0613322 A3 19941102; EP 0613322 B1 20000816; DE 613322 T1 19950713; DE 69425517 D1 20000921; DE 69425517 T2 20010426; JP H06233379 A 19940819; US 5452366 A 19950919

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69425517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980406

1995-07-13 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

1995-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950413

1995-05-05 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB