Global patent index - EP 0613958 B1

EP 0613958 B1 2000-08-23 - Process for continuously annealing steel strip

Title (en)

Process for continuously annealing steel strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Glühen von Stahlband

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le recuit en continu de bandes d'acier

Publication

EP 0613958 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93910337 A

Priority

  • JP 9300633 W
  • JP 15624392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9324664A1] To provide equipment for continuously annealing a steel strip which has been cold-rolled, intended to stably operate an annealing furnace by preventing the slip of bridle rolls and hearth rolls. The diameter D of bridle rolls (2) is set so that a surface pressure p &cir& _ expressed by the equation p=h( sigma 1+ sigma 2)/D becomes not lower than 10 kPa (kilopascal); wherein sigma 1 is unit tension of the portion of a steel strip (1) which is on the upstream side of bridle rolls (2) and hearth rolls (3) in a furnace; sigma 2 unit tension of the portion of the steel strip (1) which is on the downstream side of the rolls (2, 3); h &cir& _ the thickness of the steel strip; and D the diameter of the bridle rolls (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/563 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9324664 A1 19931209; CN 1028880 C 19950614; CN 1080661 A 19940112; DE 69329272 D1 20000928; DE 69329272 T2 20010208; EP 0613958 A1 19940907; EP 0613958 A4 19961023; EP 0613958 B1 20000823; JP 3203581 B2 20010827; KR 960006583 B1 19960520

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130514

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130512

2013-06-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130512

2013-05-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69329272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69329272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329272

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-09-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR CONTINUOUSLY ANNEALING STEEL STRIP

1999-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOE CONTINUOUSLY ANNEALING STEEL STRIP

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981124

1996-10-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19960902

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940224

1994-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT