Global Patent Index - EP 0614075 B1

EP 0614075 B1 2000-06-21 - Method and apparatus for speech coding using Trellis Coded Quantization for Linear Predictive Coding quantization

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for speech coding using Trellis Coded Quantization for Linear Predictive Coding quantization

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sprachkodierung mit Trellis-kodierter Quantisierung für LPC- Quantisierung

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de codage de parole utilisant la quantisation codée Trellis pour la quantisation LPC

Publication

EP 0614075 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94103204 A

Priority

IT MI930406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0614075A2] It is disclosed a method and related circuits for speech coding using Trellis Coded Quantization for encoding of Linear Predictive Coding Coefficienty. In particular it uses Trellis Coded Quantization for coding Line spectrum Pairs and Reflection Coefficients parameters. The bit allocation at each quantization step of the Trellis Coded Quantizer is made variable and the quantization error accumulated in quantizing the previous values will be taken in account in the search of the optimum quantization levels of the next values. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/06 (2013.01); G10L 19/002 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/06 (2013.01); G10L 19/002 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

K. SAM SHANMUGAM: "Digital and Analog Communication Systems", JOHN WILEY & SONS, NEW YORK

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0614075 A2 19940907; EP 0614075 A3 19950802; EP 0614075 B1 20000621; DE 69424960 D1 20000727; DE 69424960 T2 20010111; IT 1271959 B 19970610; IT MI930406 A1 19940904; IT MI930406 D0 19930303

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020303

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424960 20000727

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BORSANO CORRADO

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

2000-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 19/04 A

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPEECH CODING USING TRELLIS CODED QUANTIZATION FOR LINEAR PREDICTIVE CODING QUANTIZATION

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980803

1996-06-12 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

1996-05-29 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 9/14

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960111

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT