Global Patent Index - EP 0614129 B1

EP 0614129 B1 2000-05-24 - Magnetic carrier, developer comprising the carrier for developing latent electrostatic images, electrographic photoconductor, and image formation method using the same

Title (en)

Magnetic carrier, developer comprising the carrier for developing latent electrostatic images, electrographic photoconductor, and image formation method using the same

Title (de)

Magnetischer Entwicklungsträger, diesen Träger enthaltender Entwickler, electrographischer Photoleiter, und Bildherstellungsverfahren das sie verwendet

Title (fr)

Véhiculeur de développement magnétique, développeur contenant ce véhiculeur, photoconducteur électrographique, et méthode pour former une image en utilisant ce développeur

Publication

EP 0614129 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101738 A

Priority

  • JP 4206993 A
  • JP 26837393 A
  • JP 35467493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0614129A1] A magnetic carrier for use in a developer for developing latent electrostatic images is composed of magnetic carrier particles with a particle size of 35 mu m or less in an amount of 15 wt.% or more, and a developer is composed of the above carrier and a toner. An image formation method is composed of the steps of (a) uniformly charging the surface of a photoconductor to a predetermined polarity, (b) forming latent electrostatic images including low potential portions and high potential portions on the photoconductor by subjecting the charged surface of the photoconductor to selective light radiation corresponding to light images, thereby selectively reducing the potential of the surface of the photoconductor, and (c) developing the thus formed latent electrostatic images to visible toner images by bringing the developer into contact with the latent-electrostatic-images-bearing photoconductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/107; G03G 5/06; G03G 5/082

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/02 (2006.01); G03G 5/06 (2006.01); G03G 5/082 (2006.01); G03G 5/10 (2006.01); G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 9/10 (2006.01); G03G 9/107 (2006.01); G03G 13/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/08207 (2013.01); G03G 5/06 (2013.01); G03G 5/08221 (2013.01); G03G 5/10 (2013.01); G03G 9/1075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0614129 A1 19940907; EP 0614129 B1 20000524; DE 69424584 D1 20000629; DE 69424584 T2 20000921; JP 3219926 B2 20011015; JP H07146591 A 19950606; US 5981127 A 19991109; US 6077637 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080204

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080204

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424584

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961009

1995-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950223

1994-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB