Global Patent Index - EP 0614405 B2

EP 0614405 B2 2004-12-29 - IMPROVED PANEL CLINCHING METHODS

Title (en)

IMPROVED PANEL CLINCHING METHODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON PLATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES AMELIORES D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MINCES FEUILLES DE TOLE

Publication

EP 0614405 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92923611 A

Priority

  • AU 9200631 W
  • AU PK974291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9310925A1] In a clinched joint (11) to secure panels (12, 13) together, a rivet or slug (10) is driven into the clinched joint (11) as it is formed, and the inner end of the rivet or slug (10) is outwardly-deformed to increase both the shear and axial separation load strengths of the clinched joint (11). Rings (410) or components (510, 610), which may form parts of sub-assemblies, may also be secured to the pannels (412, 413; 512, 513; 612, 613) by the clinching methods, the rings (410) or components (510, 610) acting as the dies for the joints (411, 511, 611).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/04; B21D 39/03; B23P 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/03 (2006.01); B21J 15/02 (2006.01); B21J 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/025 (2013.01); B21D 39/031 (2013.01); B21J 15/36 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9310925 A1 19930610; AT 186484 T 19991115; BR 9206821 A 19951212; CA 2123886 A1 19930610; CN 1041287 C 19981223; CN 1078672 A 19931124; DE 69230291 D1 19991216; DE 69230291 T2 20000608; DE 69230291 T3 20050811; EP 0614405 A1 19940914; EP 0614405 A4 19970205; EP 0614405 B1 19991110; EP 0614405 B2 20041229; ES 2141115 T3 20000316; IN 178893 B 19970719; JP 3346566 B2 20021118; JP H07503663 A 19950420; KR 100270634 B1 20001201; MX 9206870 A 19930701

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121124

2012-12-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20121124

2012-11-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69230291

2012-11-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69230291

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-02-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051125

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031126

2004-12-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031126

2002-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2000-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-10-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ECKOLD GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141115 T3

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-02-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-01-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-01-10 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000110

1999-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230291 19991216

1999-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 19991130

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 19991130

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991125

1999-11-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 19991125

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19991125

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-11-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 186484 T 19991115

1997-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970612

1997-02-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960924

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1994-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940610

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE