Global Patent Index - EP 0614408 B1

EP 0614408 B1 2000-01-05 - RAZOR WITH BLADE PROTECTION MEANS

Title (en)

RAZOR WITH BLADE PROTECTION MEANS

Title (de)

RASIERER MIT EINEM KLINGENSCHUTZMITTEL

Title (fr)

RASOIR EQUIPE D'UN SYSTEME PROTEGEANT LES LAMES

Publication

EP 0614408 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93900586 A

Priority

  • GB 9125262 A
  • US 9210054 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9310946A1] The tandem blades (50, 51) of a razor can be protected when not in use for shaving, without disturbing a pre-set shaving geometry and with reduced risk of damage to the blades (50, 51) and the fingers of a user during manipulation, by providing a shaving cartridge (11) which is movable, relative to a handle (10) of the razor, for retraction behind a shield (23) formed in the handle. Also disclosed are means to provide, in such a razor, replaceable cartridges (11) for a permanent handle (10) which includes a cartridge carrier (61).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/22; B26B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/52 (2006.01); B26B 21/22 (2006.01); B26B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/225 (2013.01); B26B 21/222 (2013.01); B26B 29/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9310946 A1 19930610; AU 3221093 A 19930628; AU 670423 B2 19960718; BR 9206820 A 19950516; CA 2124859 A1 19930610; CA 2124859 C 19981013; DE 69327518 D1 20000210; EP 0614408 A1 19940914; EP 0614408 A4 19950111; EP 0614408 B1 20000105; GB 9125262 D0 19920129; IN 186985 B 20011222; JP H07501254 A 19950209

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111120

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111120

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69327518 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

1997-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970917

1995-03-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-01-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19941129

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

1995-01-04 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26B 21/22

1994-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940621

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT