Global Patent Index - EP 0614762 B1

EP 0614762 B1 2001-03-14 - Ink tank

Title (en)

Ink tank

Title (de)

Tintenbehälter

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'encre

Publication

EP 0614762 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94101076 A

Priority

  • EP 90201875 A
  • EP 84306887 A
  • JP 10284184 A
  • JP 10284284 A
  • JP 10284384 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0398452A2] A dot matrix printer head comprising an ink supply tank (2) provided with an ink supply port (41), the ink supply tank (2) containing ink absorbing means (60 sec ,61,62) from which ink may pass to the ink supply port (41) characterised in that the ink supply tank (2) has an air hole (42) therein which commuinicates with air in at least one space (50b) between the ink absorbing means (60 sec ,61,62) and a wall (50) of the ink supply tank (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/255; B41J 2/175; B41J 2/305

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/255 (2006.01); B41J 2/305 (2006.01); B41J 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/255 (2013.01); B41J 2/305 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0398452 A2 19901122; EP 0398452 A3 19901227; EP 0398452 B1 19940810; DE 3486333 D1 19940915; DE 3486333 T2 19950216; DE 3486484 D1 20010419; DE 3486484 T2 20011108; DE 3486486 D1 20010419; DE 3486486 T2 20011108; EP 0606101 A2 19940713; EP 0606101 A3 19940727; EP 0606101 B1 20010314; EP 0614762 A1 19940914; EP 0614762 B1 20010314; HK 73195 A 19950519; SG 50606 A1 19980720; SG 50609 A1 19980720

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-06-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

- Effective date: 20011214

2004-12-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-11-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

2004-10-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041009

2004-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SOCIETE ARMOR

2003-10-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

2002-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SOCIETE ARMOR

2002-06-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-06-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOCIETE ARMOR

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

2002-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY(INTERNATIONAL) AG

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-02-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3486486 20010419

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-03-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 139508

2001-03-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 398452

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/255 A, 7B 41J 2/305 B, 7B 41J 2/175 B

2000-08-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INK TANK

1996-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960124

1994-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940125

1994-09-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 398452

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL