Global Patent Index - EP 0615400 B1

EP 0615400 B1 2000-07-12 - Microwave oven and method of determining food

Title (en)

Microwave oven and method of determining food

Title (de)

Mikrowellenofen und Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Lebenmittelproduktes

Title (fr)

Four à micro-ondes et procédé pour déterminer le produit alimentaire

Publication

EP 0615400 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94300552 A

Priority

JP 5051993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0615400A2] Gaseous alcohol and steam emanating from food being heated are detected by an alcohol sensor (11) and a steam sensor (12) respectively. A control circuit (16) obtains maximum values VAmax and VGmax serving as reference values from detection voltages generated by the alcohol and steam sensors (11, 12). Change rates DELTA A (VA/VAmax) and DELTA G (VG/VGmax) are obtained on the basis of detection voltages VA and VG detected a predetermined time (40 seconds, for example) after initiation of the heating and a ratio r of the change rates is obtained from the expression, r=(1- DELTA A)/(1- DELTA G). The control circuit (16) compares a value of the ratio r with a threshold set for each kind of food to discriminate the kind of the food, thereby setting a subsequent heating time to execute the heating. Since the ratios r vary largely depending upon presence of an alcoholic component contained in the food, the kind of the food can be reliably discriminated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/68; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/68 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0615400 A2 19940914; EP 0615400 A3 19941005; EP 0615400 B1 20000712; DE 69425168 D1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060126

2006-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425168 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

1997-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970324

1994-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-09-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940208

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB