Global Patent Index - EP 0616091 B1

EP 0616091 B1 2000-03-29 - Building blocks

Title (en)

Building blocks

Title (de)

Bausteine

Title (fr)

Blocs de construction

Publication

EP 0616091 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93600014 A

Priority

GR 92100353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0616091A1] These Cement Blocks are lightweight and multicellular; they are provided with a slab (2) as a base for the grooves (3) on one horizontal side; pyramoidal/conoidal tongues (6) on the opposite horizontal side for their mechanical interlocking. Grooves (3) are deeper than pyramoidal/conoidal tongues (6) to allow, the application of shear connectors, and bonding mortar, when desirable. They are provided with tongues/grooves (5) (4) at their opposite vertical edges; with grooves (4) deeper than tongues (5) for mortar bonding to the perimetral contact with the bearing elements. These blocks can be erected in running bond; at an angle by super-imposition; they eliminate thermal bridge, and facilitate the installation of plumbing/electrical conduits, without excessive mortar. From their fabrik they allow substantial reductions to wall plasterworks. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/26 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/26 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0616091 A1 19940921; EP 0616091 B1 20000329; DE 616091 T1 19950824; DE 69328242 D1 20000504; GR 1001284 B 19930730

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030726

2003-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030726

2002-07-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328242 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BUILDING BLOCKS

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BUILDING BLOCK

1996-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960105

1995-08-24 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1995-04-21 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1995-03-15 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

1994-12-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940901

1994-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE