Global patent index - EP 0616184 B1

EP 0616184 B1 2000-01-05 - Packed bed device with gas treatment, especially cooler

Title (en)

Packed bed device with gas treatment, especially cooler

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Behandeln eines Schüttgutbetts mit einem Gas, insbesondere Brenngutkühler

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement d'un lit tassé avec un gaz, en particulier refroidisseur

Publication

EP 0616184 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94103601 A

Priority

DE 9304121 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0616184A1] Packed bed device with gas treatment, especially cooler, comprising a push grating (1) with at least one grating element (3) which is moved to and fro in the conveying direction and to which the gas can be supplied from a stationary source (15) via a pipeline (6, 7, 8, 13, 17, 18) which comprises, inside a substantially closed grating underlying space (20) subjected to overpressure, a compensator (16) for taking up the relative movement between the stationary source and the grating element. The compensator (16) is formed by parts (17, 18) which are telescopically displaceable one inside the other. The structure of the compensator can be simple and insensitive, since leakage losses are permissible in view of the maintenance of the overpressure in the grating underlying space. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 15/02; C04B 7/47; F23H 3/02; F27B 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 7/47 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F27B 7/38 (2006.01); F27D 15/02 (2006.01); F27D 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 15/0213 (2013.01); F27D 99/0073 (2013.01); F27D 2015/0233 (2013.01); F27D 2015/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9304121 U1 19940721; AT 188544 T 20000115; DE 59409045 D1 20000210; DK 0616184 T3 20000619; EP 0616184 A1 19940921; EP 0616184 B1 20000105; ES 2142885 T3 20000501; GR 3033115 T3 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111004

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-02-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59409045

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-04-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040203

2000-11-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG AG

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-06-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142885

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59409045

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: BMH CLAUDIUS PETERS GMBH

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI SE

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188544

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEHRHAHN, HEINZ

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYER, HARTMUT

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RETZLAFF, SIEGFRIED

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STAAK, THOMAS

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BMH CLAUDIUS PETERS AG

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970618

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950317

1994-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI SE