Global Patent Index - EP 0616252 B1

EP 0616252 B1 2000-07-26 - Photographic support

Title (en)

Photographic support

Title (de)

Fotografischer Schichtträger

Title (fr)

Support photographique

Publication

EP 0616252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94100896 A

Priority

DE 4308274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0616252A2] The invention relates to a photographic layer support (carrier, base, substrate) comprising a plastic-coated support material which is provided on its reverse with a layer which has good printability with thermal printers with low soiling and discoloration by development baths, good adhesive tape adhesion, good printability with conventional printers, good abrasion and bath resistance and good antistatic finishing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/76; G03C 1/85; G03C 1/89; G03C 1/95

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 125/00 (2006.01); C09D 125/08 (2006.01); C09D 125/16 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 1/79 (2006.01); G03C 1/795 (2006.01); G03C 1/85 (2006.01); G03C 1/95 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 1/85 (2013.01); G03C 1/95 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31928 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31935 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/7614 + G03C 2001/7628

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0616252 A2 19940921; EP 0616252 A3 19950802; EP 0616252 B1 20000726; DE 4308274 A1 19940922; DE 4308274 C2 19960718; JP 3511056 B2 20040329; JP H07110542 A 19950425; US 5466536 A 19951114

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FELIX *SCHOELLER JR. FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE G.M.

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB LI NL

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960117

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB LI NL

1994-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB LI NL