Global Patent Index - EP 0616260 B1

EP 0616260 B1 2001-01-10 - Electrophotographic light-receiving member

Title (en)

Electrophotographic light-receiving member

Title (de)

Elektrophotographisches lichtempfindliches Element

Title (fr)

Elément photosensible électrophotographique

Publication

EP 0616260 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94103893 A

Priority

JP 7863693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0616260A2] To provide an electrophotographic light-receiving member having a good initial-stage electrophotographic performance and also having a good durability especially in an environment of low humidity, the light-receiving member comprises a support 101, a photoconductive layer 103 formed on the support and formed of a non-monocrystalline material mainly composed of silicon atoms, and a surface layer 104 formed of a non-monocrystalline material constituted of silicon atoms, carbon atoms, nitrogen atoms and hydrogen atoms in which silicon atoms having at least one bond to a carbon atom are in a percentage of at least 50 atom% based on the whole silicon atoms in the surface layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/082

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/08 (2006.01); G03G 5/082 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/08214 (2013.01); G03G 5/08221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0616260 A2 19940921; EP 0616260 A3 19960110; EP 0616260 B1 20010110; DE 69426543 D1 20010215; DE 69426543 T2 20010613; JP 3134974 B2 20010213; JP H06266139 A 19940922

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060314

2005-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426543 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

1997-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961129

1996-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960528

1996-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1994-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL