Global Patent Index - EP 0616658 B2

EP 0616658 B2 2001-05-23 - HAND WASHING UNIT

Title (en)

HAND WASHING UNIT

Title (de)

HANDWASCHANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE DE LAVAGE POUR LES MAINS

Publication

EP 0616658 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92923900 A

Priority

  • GB 9124819 A
  • GB 9202165 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9310311A1] A hand washing and rinsing unit which operates automatically without the need for the user to touch any part of the unit. When the user's hands are inserted into a wash basin (12), a proximity switch (30) actuates the system to switch on a supply of water through a supply line (18). After a predetermined time interval such as 5 to 8 seconds, a metered quantity of liquid soap from a supply (28) is dispensed onto the user's hands, and the supply of water continues to enable the soap to be washed off. The system incorporates an electronic monitoring system to record each use, this being triggered only when soap has been dispensed, so that it is not possible to have a wash recorded merely by wetting the hands for a few seconds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/046

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/046 (2006.01); E03C 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/245 (2013.01); E03C 1/046 (2013.01); E03C 1/057 (2013.01); A47K 2210/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9310311 A1 19930527; AT 159067 T 19971015; AU 2950892 A 19930615; DE 69222654 D1 19971113; DE 69222654 T2 19980520; EP 0616658 A1 19940928; EP 0616658 B1 19971008; EP 0616658 B2 20010523; GB 9124819 D0 19920115

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-09-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-08-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-05-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 9

1999-11-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 19991116

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 19991112

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-11-10 [REG GB 737K] REFERENCE UNDER SECT. 37(1) REFUSED - REF. AFTER GRANT CONCERNING UK ENTITLEMENT

1999-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990601

1998-11-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HMSI (EUROPE) LIMITED

1998-09-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HMSI (EUROPE) LIMITED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-09-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HMSI (EUROPE) LIMITED

- Effective date: 19980708

1998-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-04-08 [REG GB 737A] PROCEEDING UNDER SECTION 37(1) PATENTS ACT 1977

1998-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-01-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19980108

1997-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 19971231

- Year of fee payment: 6

1997-11-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971123

1997-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69222654 19971113

1997-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

1997-10-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 159067 T 19971015

1996-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960927

1995-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: POLAR BAY LIMITED

1994-09-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940530

1994-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE