Global Patent Index - EP 0616861 B2

EP 0616861 B2 2000-09-27 - Press with table- and feeding system

Title (en)

Press with table- and feeding system

Title (de)

Presse mit einem Tafelanlage- und Vorschubsystem

Title (fr)

Presse avec table- et système d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0616861 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94103285 A

Priority

DE 4309949 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0616861A1] Two numerically controlled feed devices are used in succession, the second taking over from the first feed device when two or more punching steps have already been completed. The first punching step on a new sheet is carried out with the rear row of tools of the presses simultaneously with the last punching step for the preceding sheet by the front rows of tools. Sensors (80, 82, 84, 86) determine the length and/or angularity of the cut edges in the sheet and allow the calculation of correction data for the advance of the sheets, and initial and through punching at front and rear edges is thereby avoided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/10; B21D 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/04 (2006.01); B21D 28/06 (2006.01); B21D 28/08 (2006.01); B21D 43/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/08 (2006.01); B21D 43/10 (2006.01); B26D 5/32 (2006.01); B26F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/06 (2013.01); B21D 43/003 (2013.01); B21D 43/10 (2013.01); B26D 5/32 (2013.01); B26F 1/02 (2013.01); Y10T 83/445 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4463 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4632 (2015.04); Y10T 83/464 (2015.04); Y10T 83/531 (2015.04); Y10T 83/536 (2015.04)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0616861 A1 19940928; EP 0616861 B1 19971217; EP 0616861 B2 20000927; EP 0616860 A1 19940928; EP 0616860 B1 19971022; ES 2109528 T3 19980116; ES 2111786 T3 19980316; ES 2111786 T5 20001216; JP 3650417 B2 20050518; JP 3653108 B2 20050525; JP H06297059 A 19941025; JP H06297060 A 19941025; US 5577427 A 19961126; US 5878640 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-03-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140303

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-10-18 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT

1999-07-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP AG, DUESSELDORF

- Effective date: 19980915

1999-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990101

1998-11-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FRIED. KRUPP AG HOESCH-KRUPP

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-11-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRIED. KRUPP AG HOESCH-KRUPP

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2111786 T3

1998-03-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

1998-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59404798 19980129

1998-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT

1997-12-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19971217

1997-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970317

1995-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950317

1994-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT