Global Patent Index - EP 0617392 B1

EP 0617392 B1 2000-05-10 - Measuring system

Title (en)

Measuring system

Title (de)

Messsystem

Title (fr)

Système de mesure

Publication

EP 0617392 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94200717 A

Priority

NL 9300523 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0617392A1] A measuring system comprises: an input unit which is adapted for connection to a number of sensors for respective quantities for measuring, which sensors are each adapted to generate a measurement signal representative of the value of the relevant quantity; a central signal processing unit which is connected to this input unit and which comprises marking means for marking the measurement signals; a transmitter which is connected to this central signal processing unit and which can transmit radio signals containing the marked measurement signals; a number of portable receivers which can receive these radio signals, which receivers each comprise detection means which are adapted to detect at least one measurement signal with a preselected marking; and display means connected to these selection means for displaying the relevant measurement value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0617392 A1 19940928; EP 0617392 B1 20000510; DE 69424335 D1 20000615; DE 69424335 T2 20001019; NL 9300523 A 19941017

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-03-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424335 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCOM TATECO AB

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971104

1995-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950328

1994-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE