Global Patent Index - EP 0617905 B1

EP 0617905 B1 2000-05-31 - Stick-shaped piece drive container and stick-shaped piece supplying cassette

Title (en)

Stick-shaped piece drive container and stick-shaped piece supplying cassette

Title (de)

Behälter mit verstellbarem Stift und Spender-Kassette für die Stifte

Title (fr)

Récipient avec entraînement pour pièce en forme de barre et cassette distributrice pour pièces en forme de barre

Publication

EP 0617905 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93114220 A

Priority

JP 1483993 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0617905A2] A stick-shaped piece drive container capable of preventing a stick-shaped piece from drying out by evaporating moisture is provided. A stick-shaped piece supplying cassette capable of supplying a stick-shaped piece to the stick-shaped piece drive container in a simple way is also provided. The stick-shaped piece drive container is comprised of an outer cylinder and a screw shaft having a helical groove provided on a circumference thereof and a connecting portion provided on a front end thereof, and being inserted in the outer cylinder unrotatably but movable in an axial direction thereof. An inner cylinder has a projection provided on a rear inside thereof that fits the helical groove, and is immovably mounted in the outer cylinder but is rotatable in an axial direction thereof to extend out of it forwardly. A stick-shaped piece holder is detachably coupled with the connecting portion of the screw shaft and slidably provided in the inner cylinder for holding a stick-shaped piece. A cap detachably fits the inner cylinder or the outer cylinder or both. Sealing means provided on a circumference of the stick-shaped piece holder close by fitting the inside of the inner cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/16 (2006.01); A45D 40/02 (2006.01); A45D 40/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/06 (2006.01); A45D 40/20 (2006.01); B43K 21/08 (2006.01); B43K 23/016 (2006.01); B43L 19/00 (2006.01); B43M 11/00 (2006.01); B43M 11/06 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2013.01); A45D 2040/0062 (2013.01); A45D 2040/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0617905 A2 19941005; EP 0617905 A3 19950524; EP 0617905 B1 20000531; CN 1044892 C 19990901; CN 1093332 A 19941012; DE 69328767 D1 20000706; DE 69328767 T2 20010215; JP 2585910 Y2 19981125; JP H0674382 U 19941021

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69328767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2002-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328767

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971229

1995-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950810

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1994-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT