Global Patent Index - EP 0618552 B1

EP 0618552 B1 2001-12-12 - Fraud protection for card transactions

Title (en)

Fraud protection for card transactions

Title (de)

Betrugsschutz für Kartentransaktionen

Title (fr)

Protection contre le fraude pour transactions par cartes à puce

Publication

EP 0618552 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94301904 A

Priority

US 3778793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5311594A] The problems of fraud in card transactions can be reduced by, after requiring the person engaged in the card transaction to initially identify himself, such as by supplying a card number, a) requesting, the person to supply as authentication information either 1) a randomly selected piece of prestored information or 2) information derived from a randomly selected piece of prestored information; and b) completing the transaction only if the authentication information requested is correctly supplied. The authentication information requested is described in terms of its nature, i.e., what it represents, so that one can not deduce from the request the correct response without knowing the selected prestored piece of information. Since the authentication information is randomly determined for each card transaction, a thief will rarely, if ever, be able to successfully complete a card transaction simply by supplying, in response to a request, the same piece of authentication information last supplied by the authorized person. Each authorized person already knows the particular pieces of information that are prestored for him, e.g., birthdate of spouse, year of school graduation, and mother's telephone number. Thus, he need exert no extra effort to remember them. If the pieces of prestored authentication information are various numbers they may be transmitted over a telephone network from a caller to the authorization system using currently available dial pads and DTMF signaling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01); G06Q 20/04 (2012.01); G06Q 20/34 (2012.01); G06Q 20/40 (2012.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01); H04M 3/60 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40 (2013.01); G06Q 20/4012 (2013.01); G06Q 20/4014 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40145 (2013.01); G07F 7/10 (2013.01); G07C 9/00015 (2013.01); Y10S 379/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5311594 A 19940510; CA 2114562 A1 19940927; CA 2114562 C 19970429; DE 69429379 D1 20020124; DE 69429379 T2 20020822; EP 0618552 A1 19941005; EP 0618552 B1 20011212; JP 3980077 B2 20070919; JP H0746323 A 19950214

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140315

2014-04-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140315

2014-03-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69429379

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080301

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429379 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970418

1995-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950323

1994-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT