Global patent index - EP 0619515 B1

EP 0619515 B1 2000-12-20 - Surface latent image type silver halide photographic emulsion

Title (en)

Surface latent image type silver halide photographic emulsion

Title (de)

Oberflächenlatentbildtyp Silberhalogenidemulsion

Title (fr)

Emulsion photographique à l'halogénure d'argent formant image latente superficielle

Publication

EP 0619515 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94104787 A

Priority

  • JP 10371893 A
  • JP 10371993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0619515A1] Disclosed herein is a surface latent image type silver halide photographic emulsion containing silver halide grains which have been formed in the presence of a tellurium compound which forms silver telluride in silver bromide emulsion at a pseudo-first-order reaction rate constant k of 1 x 10<-><7> min<-><1> to 1 x 10<-><1> min<-><1>, and in which tellurium ions have been thereby doped. Also disclosed is a surface latent image type silver halide photographic emulsion containing silver halide grains which have been formed by adding at least one labile tellurium compound selected from the group consisting of an organic compound containing tellurium single-bonded directly to S, SO, SO2, Se, P=O or P=S, a cyclic organic compound having at least one tellurium atom and two or more chalcogen atoms in a ring, and an organic compound containing tellurium anions, and in which tellurium ions have been thereby doped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/09 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0619515 A1 19941012; EP 0619515 B1 20001220; DE 69426431 D1 20010125; DE 69426431 T2 20010510

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426431

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-25

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980910

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950321

1994-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE