Global Patent Index - EP 0619773 B1

EP 0619773 B1 2000-03-15 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING CONSTRUCTION BLOCKS FROM A HYDRAULIC BINDER SUCH AS PLASTER, AN INERT FILLER SUCH AS SAND, AND WATER

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING CONSTRUCTION BLOCKS FROM A HYDRAULIC BINDER SUCH AS PLASTER, AN INERT FILLER SUCH AS SAND, AND WATER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BAUBLÖCKEN AUS EINEM HYDRAULISCHEN BINDEMITTEL WIE GIPS, EINEM INERTEN MATERIAL WIE SAND UND WASSER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION A PARTIR D'UN LIANT HYDRAULIQUE TEL QUE DU PLATRE, D'UNE CHARGE INERTE TELLE QUE DU SABLE ET D'EAU

Publication

EP 0619773 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 92911263 A

Priority

  • FR 9105870 A
  • FR 9200424 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2676386A1] Method and device for manufacturing a construction block by pressure moulding a mixture of a hydraulic binder such as plaster, an inert filler such as sand, and water, involving passing a mould (50) through different work stations including a station (A) for filling the mould with a measured quantity of the mixture (56), a station (B) for fitting a top plate (38) on the mould, a station (C) for compressing the mixture in the mould, a station (D) for holding the top and bottom plates (38, 40) in place in the mould, a station (E) for removing the top plate (38), and a release station (F).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/00; B28B 5/04; B28B 7/00; B28B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 3/00 (2006.01); B28B 5/04 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 5/04 (2013.01); B28B 3/00 (2013.01); B28B 17/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9220502 A1 19921126; AT 190549 T 20000415; AU 1908492 A 19921230; AU 670748 B2 19960801; DE 69230802 D1 20000420; EP 0619773 A1 19941019; EP 0619773 B1 20000315; FR 2676386 A1 19921120; JP H06509290 A 19941020; OA 9844 A 19940815; US 5507996 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2001-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BROUARD JEAN

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-09-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000514

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230802 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190549 T 20000415

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROUARD, JEAN

1999-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROUARD, JEAN

1996-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960125

1994-10-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931130

1994-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE