Global patent index - EP 0620288 B1

EP 0620288 B1 2000-11-22 - COLD-ROLLED SHEET AND HOT-GALVANIZED COLD-ROLLED SHEET, BOTH EXCELLENT IN BAKE HARDENING, COLD NONAGING AND FORMING PROPERTIES, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

COLD-ROLLED SHEET AND HOT-GALVANIZED COLD-ROLLED SHEET, BOTH EXCELLENT IN BAKE HARDENING, COLD NONAGING AND FORMING PROPERTIES, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

Kaltgewalztes Stahlblech, gegebenenfalls feuerverzinkt, mit guter Einbrenn-härtbarkeit, gute Kaltalterungsbeständigkeit und Formbarkeit und Verfahrenzur Herstellung dieser Bleche

Title (fr)

FEUILLE LAMINEE A FROID, EVENTUELLEMENT GALVANISEE A CHAUD, AUX QUALITES DE SECHAGE DE PEINTURE A CHAUD, DE NON-VIEILLISSEMENT A FROID ET DE FORMAGE EXCELLENTES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0620288 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93919599 A

Priority

  • JP 4410893 A
  • JP 9301231 W
  • JP 23230192 A
  • JP 23231992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0620288A1] A cold-rolled sheet or a hot-galvanized, cold-rolled sheet having high paint bake hardening and cold nonaging properties and being excellent in the forming properties such as an average r value (deep drawing characteristics) and elongation (bulging characteristics) is produced by annealing an ultralow-carbon steel itself or one containing at least either titanium or niobium above the Ac3 transformation point to thereby give thereto a single-phase structure of low-temperature transformation product. As regards the paint bake hardening properties, it is possible to realize a BH value as high as about 10 kgf/mm<2>. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/06; C21D 8/02; C21D 9/46; C22C 38/12; C22C 38/14; C23C 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0426 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01); C21D 8/0473 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0620288 A1 19941019; EP 0620288 A4 19950125; EP 0620288 B1 20001122; DE 69329696 D1 20001228; DE 69329696 T2 20010613; KR 0121737 B1 19971204; WO 9405823 A1 19940317

INPADOC legal status

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-09-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130830

2013-09-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69329696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69329696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-28

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COLD-ROLLED SHEET AND HOT-GALVANIZED COLD-ROLLED SHEET, BOTH EXCELLENT IN BAKE HARDENING, COLD NONAGING AND FORMING PROPERTIES, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980407

1995-01-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1995-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-10-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940527

1994-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT