Global Patent Index - EP 0620487 B1

EP 0620487 B1 2000-06-21 - Photographic processes

Title (en)

Photographic processes

Title (de)

Photographische Verarbeitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédés de traitement photographiques

Publication

EP 0620487 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94201047 A

Priority

GB 9307501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0620487A2] A method of forming a photographic colour image by a redox amplification method from an imagewise exposed photographic silver halide material containing at least one dye image-forming colour coupler which comprises treating the material with one of the processing sequences: DEV then AMP, DEV then DEV/AMP, AMP then DEV, or AMP then DEV/AMP, wherein DEV means colour developer, AMP means amplifier (AMP) and DEV/AMP means developer/amplifier, characterised in that the material is treated in at least one of the compositions more than once.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0620487 A2 19941019; EP 0620487 A3 19950802; EP 0620487 B1 20000621; DE 69424965 D1 20000727; DE 69424965 T2 20010111; GB 9307501 D0 19930602; JP H06313954 A 19941108

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070409

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060409

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060409

2005-06-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050401

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424965 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981207

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951213

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1994-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI