Global patent index - EP 0621228 B1

EP 0621228 B1 2000-01-26 - Crane towers and method of their assembly

Title (en)

Crane towers and method of their assembly

Title (de)

Krantürme und Verfahren zu ihrer Montage

Title (fr)

Tours de grue et leur procédé de montage

Publication

EP 0621228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94102113 A

Priority

DE 4305620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4305620A1] Proposed is a method of constructing and erecting cranes, in particular shipboard crane towers, by virtue of the fact that the supporting structure of the tower is prefabricated and the tower, at first open at the top, is given a finish preservative treatment and is erected, the prefabricated modules containing individual components or several individual components are inserted into the tower and are connected to the supporting structure and/or to one another, and the tower is then closed from above. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/62; B66C 23/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/10 (2006.01); B66C 23/00 (2006.01); B66C 23/26 (2006.01); B66C 23/52 (2006.01); B66C 23/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 27/10 (2013.01); B66C 23/52 (2013.01); B66C 23/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4305620 A1 19940825; AT 189181 T 20000215; EP 0621228 A1 19941026; EP 0621228 B1 20000126; JP H0789695 A 19950404; NO 308350 B1 20000904; NO 940375 A 19940825; NO 940375 D0 19940207

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59409096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL SE

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189181

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRUPP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH

1997-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970226

1995-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950227

1994-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL SE