Global Patent Index - EP 0622112 B1

EP 0622112 B1 2000-03-01 - An agitator blade

Title (en)

An agitator blade

Title (de)

Rührerblatt

Title (fr)

Pale d'agitation

Publication

EP 0622112 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94106477 A

Priority

  • JP 12484393 A
  • JP 28565393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0622112A1] An agitator blade (2) comprises a plurality of local agitators (22) mounted on a mounting frame (21), which in turn is secured to an agitator shaft (12). The agitator shaft (12) is rotated by a motor (13) to drive the local agitators (22) to mix the fluid thoroughly. When applied for agitation and mixing processes, the agitator blade (2) of this invention can realize a high degree of mixing easily and reliably in a short period of time and with a small driving power. Further, the construction of this agitator blade (2) is simple. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00241 (2013.01); B01F 7/00591 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0622112 A1 19941102; EP 0622112 B1 20000301; DE 69423122 D1 20000406; DE 69423122 T2 20000928; JP H078776 A 19950113

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110426

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110426

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423122

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KANSAI CHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO. LTD

- Free text: KANSAI CHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO. LTD#9-7, MINAMINANAMATSU-CHO 2-CHOME#AMAGASAKI-SHI HYOGO 660 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- KANSAI CHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO. LTD#9-7, MINAMINANAMATSU-CHO 2-CHOME#AMAGASAKI-SHI HYOGO 660 (JP)

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100414

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423122 20000406

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

1996-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960621

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950320

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE