Global Patent Index - EP 0622512 B1

EP 0622512 B1 2000-10-11 - Door fitting

Title (en)

Door fitting

Title (de)

Türbeschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure de porte

Publication

EP 0622512 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94106681 A

Priority

DE 4314342 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0622512A2] Door fitting (11) having a door fitting part (19) which can be connected to a door leaf (17) and can be pivoted about a pivot axis (43) with respect to a securing fitting part (15) which can be connected to a securing device, in particular a wall (13), - a lifting device (20) being provided between the door fitting part (19) and the securing fitting part (15), - the lifting device (20) exhibiting a supporting part (21) for axial connection of the door fitting part (19) to the securing fitting part (15), - the door fitting part (19) being axially displaceable with respect to the supporting part (21), and - a rolling-body arrangement (33) with at least one rolling body being provided between the supporting part (21) and the securing fitting part (15), and - there being provided, on the supporting-part side, at least one rolling-body track which, at least in certain areas, is inclined with respect to the normal plane of the pivot axis (43). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2006.01); E05F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/061 (2013.01); E05D 11/00 (2013.01); A47K 2003/367 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0622512 A2 19941102; EP 0622512 A3 19950906; EP 0622512 B1 20001011; AT 196941 T 20001015; DE 4314342 A1 19941103

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-12-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LIDO DUSCHABTRENNUNGEN PRODUKTIONS-G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010429

2001-04-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-04-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-04-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-01-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409546

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-10-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196941

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970103

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960226

1995-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IT LU NL SE