Global patent index - EP 0622588 B2

EP 0622588 B2 2000-03-08 - Shut-off device for conduits having a large cross-section, especially for power plant exhaust and flue gas conduits

Title (en)

Shut-off device for conduits having a large cross-section, especially for power plant exhaust and flue gas conduits

Title (de)

Absperrvorrichtung für Kanäle mit grossen Querschnitten, insbesondere für Abgas- und Rauchgaskanäle von Kraftwerken

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'obturation pour conduites avec grande section transversale, en particulier conduites pour gaz d'échappement et gaz de fumée d'une centrale

Publication

EP 0622588 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94104821 A

Priority

DE 4313894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4313894C1] The invention relates to a duct housing having a sealing-air duct as a stop for a cut-off flap with a double seal around the peripheral edge for blowing in sealing air. The sealing-air duct is divided into sealing-air duct sections. The sealing-air duct sections form expansion joints between them and adjoin the duct housing in the longitudinal direction with a given freedom of movement. The expansion joints are bridged by internal tube sections which are inserted in the sealing-air duct sections with a sealing effect. The longitudinally movable sealing-air duct sections guarantee satisfactory compensation of the thermal expansions occurring as a result of temperature differences. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 11/00; F16K 11/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4313894 C1 19940818; AT 141400 T 19960815; EP 0622588 A2 19941102; EP 0622588 A3 19950405; EP 0622588 B1 19960814; EP 0622588 B2 20000308

INPADOC legal status

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-04-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140325

2014-04-02 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140326

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130303

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-06-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-05-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-03-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR GB NL

1999-12-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

1999-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NEM POWER SYSTEMS NIEDERLASSUNG DEUTSCHLAND DER NE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

1998-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NEM POWER-SYSTEMS, NIEDERLASSUNG DEUTSCHLAND DER N

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

1998-04-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NEM POWER-SYSTEMS, NIEDERLASSUNG DEUTSCHLAND DER N

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

1997-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19970513

1997-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970331

1997-03-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970326

1997-01-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

1996-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960906

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR GB NL

1996-08-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19960814

1996-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 141400

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960201

1995-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950819

1995-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR GB NL

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR GB NL