Global Patent Index - EP 0622763 B2

EP 0622763 B2 2000-08-30 - Coin sorting apparatus

Title (en)

Coin sorting apparatus

Title (de)

Sortiervorrichtung für Münzen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour trier des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0622763 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93121155 A

Priority

DE 9306231 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0622763A1] Coin-sorting apparatus (10) with electromagnetically actuated, pivotably mounted flaps (18, 20, 22, 24, 28) in at least two planes one above the other which guide the coins entering from above into associated accepting shafts or the like, the electromagnets assuming an active current-receiving state and an inactive state and being pretensioned into the inactive state by means of a spring, and a control device generating control signals for the electromagnets according to coin-value signals from a coin tester arranged above the sorting apparatus, the flap in the lower plane having a perforation or recess, the optical axis of a light barrier (A, B) being aligned with the perforation or recess, and the control device generating a cut-out signal for the electromagnet of at least one flap when a coin moves into the light barrier or out of this. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/36 (2006.01); G07D 3/00 (2006.01); G07D 3/14 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/04 (2013.01); B07C 5/36 (2013.01); G07D 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9306231 U1 19930701; EP 0622763 A1 19941102; EP 0622763 B1 19960410; EP 0622763 B2 20000830; ES 2086864 T3 19960701; ES 2086864 T5 20001116; US 5496212 A 19960305

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59302197

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-11-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-08-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 3/12 A

1997-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1997-03-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ACT GESELLSCHAFT FUER SOFT-UND HARDWARESYSTEME MBH

- Effective date: 19970109

1997-03-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WH MUENZPRUEFER DIETMAR TRENNER GMBH

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19961231

1996-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19961231

1996-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1996-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2086864 T3

1996-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1996-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960415

1996-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59302197 19960515

1996-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG PATENTANWAELTE

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-04-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960410

1995-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950829

1995-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950329

1994-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE