Global Patent Index - EP 0623179 B2

EP 0623179 B2 2001-02-14 - HIGH MODULUS POLYESTER YARN FOR TIRE CORDS AND COMPOSITES

Title (en)

HIGH MODULUS POLYESTER YARN FOR TIRE CORDS AND COMPOSITES

Title (de)

POLYESTERGARNE MIT HOHEM MODUL FUER REIFENKORDEN UND VERBUNDMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

FIL DE POLYESTER A MODULE ELEVE POUR CABLES DE PNEUS ET COMPOSITES

Publication

EP 0623179 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93901119 A

Priority

  • US 9211063 W
  • US 82279992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9314252A1] Yarns are prepared by spinning PEN or other semi-crystalline polyester polymers made from similarly rigid monomer combinations to a state of optimum amorphous orientation and crystallinity. This is accomplished by selection of process parameters to form an undrawn polyester yarn of birefringence at least 0.030. The spun yarn is then hot drawn to a total draw ratio of between 1.5/1 and 6.0/1 with the resulting drawn semi-crystalline polyester yarn having Tg greater than 100 DEG C and a melting point elevation at least 8 DEG C. The preferred yarn has a tenacity at least 6.5 g/d, dimensional stability (EASL + Shrinkage) of less than 5 %, and shrinkage 4 % or less. The resulting yarn exhibits surprisingly high modulus and tenacity together with low shrinkage when compared to prior art yarns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D02G 3/48 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9314252 A1 19930722; AU 3331293 A 19930803; BR 9207038 A 19951205; CA 2126328 A1 19930722; CA 2126328 C 20020521; CN 1051586 C 20000419; CN 1078508 A 19931117; DE 69213474 D1 19961010; DE 69213474 T2 19970206; DE 69213474 T3 20010823; EP 0623179 A1 19941109; EP 0623179 B1 19960904; EP 0623179 B2 20010214; ES 2091589 T3 19961101; ES 2091589 T5 20010516; JP 2629075 B2 19970709; JP H06511293 A 19941215; KR 100235758 B1 20000115; MX 9300142 A 19940729; TR 28032 A 19951211; TW 224960 B 19940611

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061223

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061223

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071109

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061222

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061222

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-02-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-02-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-10-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PERFORMANCE FIBERS, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-08-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PERFORMANCE FIBERS INC.

- Free text: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.#101 COLUMBIA ROAD#MORRISTON, NJ 07962 (US) -TRANSFER TO- PERFORMANCE FIBERS INC.#338 PEA RIDGE ROAD#MONCURE, NC 27559 (US)

2005-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Free text: ALLIEDSIGNAL INC.#101 COLUMBIA ROAD, P.O. BOX 2245#MORRISTOWN, NEW JERSEY 07962-2245 (US) -TRANSFER TO- HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.#101 COLUMBIA ROAD#MORRISTON, NJ 07962 (US)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-04-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-04-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-02-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ACORDIS AG

2000-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG

2000-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG PATENTE UND LIZENZEN

2000-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ACORDIS AG

2000-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RH"NE-POULENC FILTEC AG

2000-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG PATENTE UND LIZENZEN

1999-12-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ACORDIS AG * 19970530 RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG * 19

- Effective date: 19970603

1999-11-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ACORDIS AG * 19970530 RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG * 19

- Effective date: 19970603

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG PATENTE UND LIZENZEN

1998-04-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG * 970530 RHONE-POULENC FILTEC

- Effective date: 19970603

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG PATENTE UND LIZENZE

1997-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG

1997-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG

- Effective date: 19970603

1997-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHONE-POULENC FILTEC AG

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG PATENTE UND LIZENZE

- Effective date: 19970604

1997-07-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL FASER AG

- Effective date: 19970603

1996-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2091589 T3

1996-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69213474 19961010

1996-09-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1995-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950210

1994-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLIEDSIGNAL INC.

1994-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940622

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL