Global Patent Index - EP 0623437 B1

EP 0623437 B1 2001-12-19 - Cutting apparatus

Title (en)

Cutting apparatus

Title (de)

Schneidapparat

Title (fr)

Appareil à couper

Publication

EP 0623437 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94109553 A

Priority

  • EP 90118185 A
  • JP 12256290 A
  • JP 24767489 A
  • JP 27689389 A
  • JP 29883589 A
  • JP 32223789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0418915A2] The invention relates to a cutting apparatus comprising an endless chain body (2) having a plurality of plate-like links (1) connected to each other for angular movement in a common plane. Each link (1) has an end face on an inner peripheral side of the chain body (2), and at least a part of the links (1) are provided with a cutting device (4) at the end face thereof. The apparatus further comprises a plurality of sprockets (88,112) supporting the chain body (2) in tension, and defining a common plane of cut effected by the combination of the chain body (2) and the sprockets (88,112). The chain body (2) is supported by a rigid backplate (118), of thickness not greater than the thickness of the links (1). It provides a firm support to the rotating chain body (2) to permit sliding movement of the chain body (2) within the common plane of cut. The apparatus further comprises a means (92) for activating the rotational movement of the sprockets in cooperation with the chain body (2), and a means (58) for moving an object (W) or the chain body (2) toward each other to effect removal of a material disposed within the extended plane of the common plane of cut to effect separation of an object (W) into severed sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/08; B28D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 17/08 (2006.01); B27B 33/14 (2006.01); B28D 1/08 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 33/145 (2013.01); B27B 17/08 (2013.01); B27B 33/14 (2013.01); B27B 33/144 (2013.01); B27B 33/148 (2013.01); B28D 1/082 (2013.01); B28D 1/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0418915 A2 19910327; EP 0418915 A3 19910925; EP 0418915 B1 19941228; DE 69015532 D1 19950209; DE 69015532 T2 19950608; DE 69033884 D1 20020131; DE 69033884 T2 20020718; EP 0623437 A2 19941109; EP 0623437 A3 19951115; EP 0623437 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033884 20020131

2001-12-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 418915

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991020

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960110

1995-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1994-11-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 418915

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT