Global Patent Index - EP 0623694 B2

EP 0623694 B2 2001-05-02 - Gripper strap for weaving looms

Title (en)

Gripper strap for weaving looms

Title (de)

Greiferband für Webmaschinen

Title (fr)

Ruban à griffes pour métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 0623694 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 94106840 A

Priority

IT MI930894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0623694A1] A gripper strap, to move the weft feeding grippers along the shed of shuttleless looms, is formed in two distinct parts made of different materials, the end part of said strap where the gripper is mounted consisting of an interchangeable element, separate from the rest of the strap and removably connected thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0623694 A1 19941109; EP 0623694 B1 19970326; EP 0623694 B2 20010502; AT 150807 T 19970415; DE 69402236 D1 19970430; DE 69402236 T2 19970717; DE 69402236 T3 20011025; DK 0623694 T3 19970825; ES 2099987 T3 19970601; ES 2099987 T5 20010901; GR 3023702 T3 19970930; IT 1272408 B 19970623; IT MI930894 A1 19941106; IT MI930894 D0 19930505; SI 0623694 T1 19971031

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *NUOVA VAMATEX S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20140502

2014-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130416

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100502

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100502

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-09-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-07-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2001-07-20 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19940521

2001-03-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-01-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2001-01-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000502

1999-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 19990531

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-05-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19990518

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-05-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 19990511

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-04-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 19990430

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-04-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 19990423

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-04-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19990422

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-04-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 19990422

- Year of fee payment: 6

1998-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PICANOL N.V.

1998-03-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PICANOL N.V.

- Effective date: 19971217

1997-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Effective date: 19971130

1997-08-29 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3023702

1997-08-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19970421

1997-06-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: 72880

1997-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2099987 T3

1997-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

1997-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-05-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970502

1997-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

1997-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69402236 19970430

1997-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 940521

1997-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 150807 T 19970415

1996-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951215

1995-08-23 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19950428

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940502

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1994-11-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 940521