Global Patent Index - EP 0623772 B1

EP 0623772 B1 2000-09-20 - Solenoid valve

Title (en)

Solenoid valve

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch betätigbares Ventil

Title (fr)

Electrovanne

Publication

EP 0623772 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94103772 A

Priority

DE 4315013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0623772A2] Solenoid valve comprising a magnet coil (2) which is arranged in a housing (1), is of ring-shaped design and surrounds a metallic magnet armature (3) which can be moved backwards and forwards in the axial direction of the magnet coil (2), the magnet armature (3) being provided at the end (5) facing the valve seat (4) with a sealing body (6) made of elastomeric material. The magnet armature (3) and the sealing body (6) are connected positively to one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/0658 (2013.01); F16K 31/0696 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0623772 A2 19941109; EP 0623772 A3 19950215; EP 0623772 B1 20000920; CA 2122857 A1 19941107; CA 2122857 C 19981103; DE 4315013 A1 19941110; DE 4315013 C2 20000615; ES 2150955 T3 20001216; JP H06331054 A 19941129

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070311

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060313

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2005-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150955 T3

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1996-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960924

1995-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950125

1995-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT