Global patent index - EP 0623866 B1

EP 0623866 B1 2000-03-01 - Current source arrangement to produce multiple reference currents

Title (en)

Current source arrangement to produce multiple reference currents

Title (de)

Stromquellenanordnung zur Erzeugung mehrfacher Referenzströme

Title (fr)

Dispositif source de courant pour produire des courants de références multiples

Publication

EP 0623866 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94106982 A

Priority

DE 4315296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0623866A2] To supply distributed circuit arrangements having preferably identical structures with reference currents, a current source arrangement is proposed which has a current source which generates a reference current which, with the aid of a plurality of parallel-connected transistors which are arranged spatially close to one another, into a number of reference currents corresponding to the plurality. The transistors are included in a control for the reference current, that is to say for the sum of the reference currents, and are connected at the output end to the distributed circuit arrangements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0623866 A2 19941109; EP 0623866 A3 19950111; EP 0623866 B1 20000301; DE 4315296 A1 19941110; DE 4315296 C2 20000302

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140506

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140503

2014-05-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140503

2014-05-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59409161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111107

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-08-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110707 AND 20110713

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961118

1995-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950207

1995-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT