Global Patent Index - EP 0623896 B1

EP 0623896 B1 2000-07-05 - Chip card and chip card reading device

Title (en)

Chip card and chip card reading device

Title (de)

Chipkarte und Lesegerät für eine Chipkarte

Title (fr)

Carte à puce et dispositif de lecture d'une carte à puce

Publication

EP 0623896 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94105920 A

Priority

DE 4314614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0623896A2] A chip card is proposed having a microcomputer located on the chip card and a program and data connected to the said microcomputer, in which the data are stored compressed in the memory. In addition, the chip card contains a decoding table, so that the microprocessor is capable of decompressing the compressed data before reading out. By this means, significantly more information can be stored on the chip card in the same memory volume, without the connected device noting this. By means of a corresponding reading device it is possible to cause the cards to be read out in compressed or in decompressed form. Through this, the data throughput in chip card readers can be considerably increased, if large quantities of data are to be read out within a short time. Reading devices in chip cards are particularly advantageously applied in broadcast receivers in which data, for example RDS data, are transmitted as information additional to the broadcast programme. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/07; G08G 1/09; H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/073 (2006.01); H04H 40/18 (2008.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 60/98 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 40/18 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 60/98 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0623896 A2 19941109; EP 0623896 A3 19950628; EP 0623896 B1 20000705; DE 4314614 A1 19941110; DE 4314614 C2 19970424

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140417

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140415

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-05-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140415

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-04-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409415

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2007-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: IPCOM GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-09-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409415

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CHIP CARD AND CHIP CARD READING DEVICE

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990422

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951228

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE