Global Patent Index - EP 0624327 B1

EP 0624327 B1 2002-09-04 - Improvements relating to pull-out shelf support systems

Title (en)

Improvements relating to pull-out shelf support systems

Title (de)

Verbesserungen in Bezug auf ausziehbare Regalstützsysteme

Title (fr)

Améliorations concernant de systèmes de support d'étagères extensibles

Publication

EP 0624327 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94300389 A

Priority

GB 9300903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2274241A] A shelf 17 on a frame 18, 19 sits within a tray-like structure provided by an intermediate frame 8, while the latter is supported by rails 6 and rollers 7. When pushed back into the storage position, the shelf 17 is stopped by a bar on the frame 8, with the rollers 21 on the shelf 17 at the rear ends of slots 12 in side plates 9 of the intermediate frame 8. The intermediate frame 8 is arrested by the outer framework 1. To gain clear access, the shelf 17 is pulled out horizontally, and it can shift with respect to the intermediate frame 8 a distance corresponding to the length of the slots 12. When it reaches the limit of this travel, the frame 8 is entrained and continued pulling draws it out, running on the rollers 7 and 13. The limit of its travel is defined by stops (not shown) but when achieved the shelf 17 is fully clear of the framework and thus fully accessible. To restore the storage position, the shelf is simply pushed in again. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/10; A47B 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/493 (2017.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/493 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2274241 A 19940720; GB 2274241 B 19960605; GB 9300903 D0 19930310; DE 69431268 D1 20021010; DE 69431268 T2 20031211; EP 0624327 A2 19941117; EP 0624327 A3 19960619; EP 0624327 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110119

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69431268

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GRAINGER, ALLAN

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRAINGER, ALLAN

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431268 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980119

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961219

1996-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE