Global Patent Index - EP 0624538 B1

EP 0624538 B1 2000-01-26 - Sheet sorter

Title (en)

Sheet sorter

Title (de)

Blattsortiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Trieuse de feuilles

Publication

EP 0624538 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94111474 A

Priority

  • EP 90119912 A
  • JP 27114689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0423758A2] The present invention provides a sheet sorting apparatus (1) comprising plural bins trays (B1-Bn); bin tray moving means (42, 43a) for moving said bin trays (B1-Bn) stepwise to cause each of the bin trays (B1-Bn) to face a sheet receiving position; and control means (110) for controlling the operating speed of said bin tray moving means (42, 43a) according to sheet transporting information of an image forming apparatus to be connected to said sorting apparatus (1), in such a manner that said bin tray moving means (42, 43) can be operated in continuous manner even during the discharge of a sheet (P) into a bin tray (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/11; B65H 31/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/11 (2013.01); B65H 2403/511 (2013.01); B65H 2408/113 (2013.01); B65H 2408/1141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0423758 A2 19910424; EP 0423758 A3 19920102; EP 0423758 B1 19960410; DE 69026459 D1 19960515; DE 69026459 T2 19961114; DE 69033439 D1 20000302; DE 69033439 T2 20000706; EP 0624538 A2 19941117; EP 0624538 A3 19941207; EP 0624538 B1 20000126; EP 0822156 A2 19980204; EP 0822156 A3 19980211; JP H03133875 A 19910607; JP H089453 B2 19960131

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-06-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-06-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033439 20000302

2000-01-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 423758

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-09-22 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

1996-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960617

1995-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950424

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-11-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 423758

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT