Global patent index - EP 0624580 B1

EP 0624580 B1 2000-02-09 - Styrylcoumarin compound, photosensitive resin composition, and hologram recording medium

Title (en)

Styrylcoumarin compound, photosensitive resin composition, and hologram recording medium

Title (de)

Styrylcoumarin Verbindung, fotoempfindliche Harzzusammenstellung und Aufzeichnungsmaterial für Hologramme

Title (fr)

Composé de styrylcoumarin, compostion de résine photosensible et milieu d'enregistrement pour hologramme

Publication

EP 0624580 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94107227 A

Priority

JP 13248293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0624580A1] A styrylcoumarin compound jointing a styryl group by - (C=C)n - portion and having -NR1R2 group, wherein n is an integer of 2 to 4, and each R is a proton or an alkyl group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms. A photopolymerizable composition comprises the styrylcoumarin compound as a photosensitizer, a polymerization initiator and a polymerizable compound. A photocrosslinking composition comprises the styrylcoumarin compound as a photosensitizer, a crosslinking agent and a polymerizable compound. A volume phase hologram recording medium which comprises the styrylcoumarin compound, a crosslinking agent and a polymer comprising a carbazole. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 311/16; C07D 455/02; C07D 455/04; C07D 491/16; G03C 1/73; G03H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 311/00 (2006.01); C07D 311/16 (2006.01); C07D 455/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/16 (2006.01); C07D 519/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/50 (2006.01); C08F 4/00 (2006.01); C09K 3/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/73 (2006.01); G03F 7/028 (2006.01); G03H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03H 1/02 (2013.01); C07D 311/16 (2013.01); C07D 455/04 (2013.01); G03C 1/73 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0264 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • English translation of JP-A-2 279 702
  • MASARU MATSUOKA, "Cyanine Dyes, Infrared Absorbing Dyes", pages 19-33, Plenum Press

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0624580 A1 19941117; EP 0624580 B1 20000209; DE 69422939 D1 20000316; DE 69422939 T2 20000629; JP 3084677 B2 20000904; JP H06324615 A 19941125; US 5879837 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070509

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070509

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: YOSHINAGA, YOKO, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * MATSUMURA, SUSUMU, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * TANIGUCHI, NAOSATO, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * KOBAYASHI, SHIN, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * SUDO, TOSHIYUKI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * MORISHIMA, HIDEKI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * KANEKO, TADASHI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2000-05-31 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: YOSHINAGA, YOKO, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * MATSUMURA, SUSUMU, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * TANIGUCHI, NAOSATO, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * KOBAYASHI, SHIN, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * SUDO, TOSHIYUKI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * MORISHIMA, HIDEKI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA * KANEKO, TADASHI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69422939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970724

1995-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950403

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB