Global patent index - EP 0624697 B1

EP 0624697 B1 2000-07-19 - Stressed steel reinforcement for prestressed concrete sleepers with grouted anchoring

Title (en)

Stressed steel reinforcement for prestressed concrete sleepers with grouted anchoring

Title (de)

Spannstahlbewehrung in Spannbetonschwellen mit Vorspannung mit nachträglichem Verbund

Title (fr)

Armature tendue en acier pour traverses en béton précontraint avec ancrage injecté

Publication

EP 0624697 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94103556 A

Priority

DE 4315402 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0624697A1] In order to avoid permanent cracks in the case of prestressed-concrete sleepers with post-tensioning which are subjected to high loading, it is proposed to use as stressing reinforcement, in place of the hitherto-used smooth hairpin-shaped stressing bars, those of profiled cold-drawn steel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/30 (2006.01); B28B 23/04 (2006.01); B28B 23/06 (2006.01); E01B 3/34 (2006.01); E04C 3/26 (2006.01); E04C 5/03 (2006.01); E04C 5/08 (2006.01); E04C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/08 (2013.01); B28B 7/303 (2013.01); B28B 23/046 (2013.01); B28B 23/06 (2013.01); E01B 3/34 (2013.01); E04C 3/26 (2013.01); E04C 5/03 (2013.01); E04C 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0624697 A1 19941117; EP 0624697 B1 20000719; AT 194862 T 20000815; EP 0625414 A1 19941123; ES 1026242 U 19940401; ES 1026242 Y 19940901; ES 2112216 T1 19980401; ES 2112216 T3 20001101; PT 624697 E 20001229

INPADOC legal status

2011-04-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-09-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2007-09-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2006-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060301

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050309

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2112216

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2000-07-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194862

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFLEIDERER INFRASTRUKTURTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-22 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: LENZI & C.

1998-04-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2112216

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970924

1995-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941125

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT