Global Patent Index - EP 0624772 B1

EP 0624772 B1 2000-08-30 - Heat-exchanger for motor vehicle

Title (en)

Heat-exchanger for motor vehicle

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur notamment pour véchicule automobile

Publication

EP 0624772 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94107180 A

Priority

FR 9305650 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0624772A1] A heat exchanger comprises a bundle of tubes (4) fitted with fins (6), in which the ends (8) of the tubes (4) are mounted in a leaktight manner in the holes (14) of a manifold plate (10) on which a manifold box is mounted. End-stop means (44) are provided between the manifold box (34) and at least one end (8) of the tubes (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/165 (2013.01); F28D 1/05383 (2013.01); F28F 9/0226 (2013.01); F28F 2265/32 (2013.01); Y10S 165/477 (2013.01); Y10S 165/906 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0624772 A1 19941117; EP 0624772 B1 20000830; BR 9401945 A 19941213; DE 69425688 D1 20001005; DE 69425688 T2 20010419; FR 2705143 A1 19941118; FR 2705143 B1 19950623; US 5535821 A 19960716

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-05-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69425688

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425688 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951127

1996-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951127

1995-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950422

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT