Global Patent Index - EP 0626460 B1

EP 0626460 B1 2000-02-02 - Austenitic stainless steel with high resistance against corrosion in chloride and sulfuric environments, and uses of this steel

Title (en)

Austenitic stainless steel with high resistance against corrosion in chloride and sulfuric environments, and uses of this steel

Title (de)

Austenitischer rostfreie Stahl mit hoher Korrosionsbeständigkeit in chlorid- und schwefelenthaltende Umgebung, und seine Verwendung

Title (fr)

Acier inoxydable austénitique à haute résistance à la corrosion par les milieux chlorurés et sulfuriques et utilisations

Publication

EP 0626460 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94401110 A

Priority

FR 9306468 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0626460A1] The steel contains, in proportions by weight, from 20 to 30 % of chromium, 25 to 32 % of nickel, from 3 to 7 % of molybdenum, from 0.35 to 0.8 % of nitrogen, from 0.5 to 5.4 % of manganese, up to 0.06 % of carbon and up to 1 % of silicon. As a result of its great versatility in corrosion resistance, the steel can be employed in particular for the manufacture of equipment for decontamination of fumes, the paper pulp industry, for the chemical industry or for oil exploration, seawater plants and for the manufacture of tankers for transporting corrosive products. The steel has a very high structural stability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 30/00; C22C 38/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 30/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 30/00 (2013.01); C22C 38/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0626460 A1 19941130; EP 0626460 B1 20000202; AT 189483 T 20000215; DE 69422850 D1 20000309; DE 69422850 T2 20000817; DK 0626460 T3 20000501; ES 2141806 T3 20000401; FI 110010 B 20021115; FI 942490 A0 19940527; FI 942490 A 19941129; FR 2705689 A1 19941202; FR 2705689 B1 19950825; GR 3033108 T3 20000831; NO 302623 B1 19980330; NO 941991 A 19941129; NO 941991 D0 19940527; PT 626460 E 20000630; US 5480609 A 19960102

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080519

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080519

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080519

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080518

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INDUSTEEL CREUSOT

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070604

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20041118

2005-01-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-12-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-11-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

- Free text: USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)#4 PLACE DE LA PYRAMIDE 9#92800 PUTEAUX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)#4 PLACE DE LA PYRAMIDE 9#92800 PUTEAUX (FR)

2004-11-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

- Free text: CREUSOT-LOIRE INDUSTRIE#IMMEUBLE ILE-DE-FRANCE 4 PLACE DE LA PYRAMIDE LA DEFENCE 9#F-92800 PUTEAUX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)#4 PLACE DE LA PYRAMIDE 9#92800 PUTEAUX (FR)

2004-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INDUSTEEL CREUSOT

- Free text: INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)#4 PLACE DE LA PYRAMIDE 9#92800 PUTEAUX (FR) -TRANSFER TO- INDUSTEEL CREUSOT#LA DEFENSE 7, 11/13 COURS VALMY#92800 PUTEAUX (FR)

2004-10-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *INDUSTEEL CREUSOT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-10-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *INDUSTEEL CREUSOT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040518

2003-05-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INVENTION S.N.C.

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141806 T3

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69422850 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189483 T 20000215

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970904

1994-12-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941017

1994-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE