Global Patent Index - EP 0626461 B1

EP 0626461 B1 2000-07-12 - Iron-nickel alloy sheet for shadow mask

Title (en)

Iron-nickel alloy sheet for shadow mask

Title (de)

Bleche aus Eisen-Nickel Legierung für Schattenmaske

Title (fr)

Feuille d'alliage fer-nickel pour masque d'ombre

Publication

EP 0626461 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94100509 A

Priority

  • JP 15135193 A
  • JP 21871393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0626461A1] An alloy sheet for making a shadow mask consists essentially of 34 to 38wt.% Ni, 0.07wt.% or less Si, 0.001wt.% or less B, 0.003wt.% or less O, 0.002wt.% or less N, and the balance being Fe and inevitable impurities. The alloy sheet has an average austenite grain size (Dav) of 10.5 to 15.0 mu m, a ratio of a maximum size to the minimum size of austenite grains (Dmax/Dmin) of 1 to 15, a Vickers hardness (Hv) of 165 to 220 and satisfying a relation of 10 x Dav + 80 >/= Hv >/= 10 x Dav + 50; and gathering degree of crystal planes on said alloy sheet surface of 14% or less for {111} plane, 5 to 75% for {100} plane, 5 to 40% for {110} plane, 20% or less for {311} plane, 20% or less for {331} plane, 20% or less for {210} plane, and 20% or less for {211} plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/08; H01J 29/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/08 (2006.01); H01J 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/08 (2013.01); H01J 29/07 (2013.01); H01J 2229/0733 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0626461 A1 19941130; EP 0626461 B1 20000712; CN 1035890 C 19970917; CN 1096330 A 19941214; DE 69425189 D1 20000817; DE 69425189 T2 20010322; KR 970003641 B1 19970320

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090114

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-11-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425189 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970904

1994-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940114

1994-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB