Global Patent Index - EP 0626463 B1

EP 0626463 B1 2000-07-12 - Heat- and creepresisting steel with martensitic structure, obtained by a thermal treatment process

Title (en)

Heat- and creepresisting steel with martensitic structure, obtained by a thermal treatment process

Title (de)

Hitze- und kriechbeständiger Stahl mit einem durch einen Vergütungsprozess erzeugten martensitischen Gefüge

Title (fr)

Acier résistant aux températures élévées et au fluage, présentant une structure martensitique obtenue par un traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0626463 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94107344 A

Priority

CH 160693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5415706A] The heat- and creep-resistant steel has a martensitic microstructure produced by a heat-treatment process. The composition of the steel in percent by weight is as follows: 0.001-0.05 of carbon 0.05-0.5 of silicon 0.05-2.0 of manganese 0.05-2.0 of nickel 8.0-13.0 of chromium 0.05-1.0 of molybdenum 1.00-4.0 of tungsten 0.05-0.5 of vanadium 0.01-0.2 of niobium 2.0-6.5 of cobalt 0.1-0.3 of nitrogen, the remainder being iron and unavoidable impurities. Such a steel can be produced by forging, casting or by powder-metallurgical means. Components fabricated from this steel show a high strength and ductility at room temperature and are distinguished at temperatures of 600 DEG C. and higher by a very high creep strength and an unusually high oxidation resistance. They can therefore be used with advantage as mechanically and thermally highly stressed components in steam- and/or gas-operated power stations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/30 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/30 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5415706 A 19950516; CN 1037361 C 19980211; CN 1098444 A 19950208; DE 59409428 D1 20000817; EP 0626463 A1 19941130; EP 0626463 B1 20000712; JP 3422561 B2 20030630; JP H07138711 A 19950530

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-11-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409428 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1997-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1995-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950508

1994-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB