Global Patent Index - EP 0627244 B1

EP 0627244 B1 2000-05-31 - FIRE EXTINGUISHING COMPOSITION

Title (en)

FIRE EXTINGUISHING COMPOSITION

Title (de)

FEUERLÖSCHZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIE

Publication

EP 0627244 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93905686 A

Priority

  • RU 9300025 W
  • SU 5034846 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9314820A1] A fire extinguishing composition containing a thermally dispersible component, an oxidizer, an oxygen-containing binder and an additive, where the thermally dispersible component is a non-organic compound chosen from a group containing a chloride, sulphate, sulphide or phosphate of alkaline or alkaline-earth metals, an ammonium salt or their mixture, at the following ratio of said components in per cent by weight: thermally dispersible component 1.0-35.0, oxidizer 50.0-94.0, oxygen-containing binder 3.0-25.0, additive 1.0-25.0

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62D 1/00; A62D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/00 (2006.01); A62D 1/00 (2006.01); A62D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/06 (2013.01); A62D 1/0007 (2013.01); A62D 1/0014 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9314820 A1 19930805; AU 3651693 A 19930901; AU 664254 B2 19951109; CA 2129029 A1 19930805; CN 1052661 C 20000524; CN 1078161 A 19931110; DE 59310051 D1 20000706; EP 0627244 A1 19941207; EP 0627244 A4 19950118; EP 0627244 B1 20000531; JP H07503159 A 19950406; RU 2005517 C1 19940115

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310051 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

1996-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960710

1995-01-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1995-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-12-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940825

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT